Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note March 22, 2022
Fiscal Note January 28, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022