Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 2 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2, as amended, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 4 to HA 3, HA 5 to HA 3, HA 6 to HA 3, HA 8 to HA 3, HA 9 to HA 3, HA 10 to HA 3, HA 3, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
HS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Laid Over (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 2 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2, as amended, HA 1 to HA 3, adopted, and HA 2 to HA 3 and HA 3, as amended, pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
HS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
HS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Committed to: Legislative Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Referred: General Laws(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|