House | 02/24/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Referred: Transportation(H) | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |