Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 15, 2022
Fiscal Note March 2, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 15, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022