House | 03/22/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 02/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |