Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 4, 2022, 9:00 a.m. to 10:00 a.m, Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred: Workforce Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|