House | 04/05/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |