House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |