Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2727 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note March 25, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 2, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022