House | 04/13/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred: General Laws(H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |