House | 04/21/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |