Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SA 1, SA 1 and SS SCS, pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 4, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 53 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|