Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
H adopts CCR#2--(4133S14.1SR)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
CCR#2 S offered & adopted (O'Laughlin)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
H distributes CCR#2/CCS#2--(4133S.14S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Senate conferees: O'Laughlin, Koenig, Eslinger, Arthur, Schupp
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
House conferees: Basye, Francis, Haffner, Sharp(36), Proudie
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
H grants further conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Motion to allow S conferees to exceed the differences on section 160.077 S adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
S requests H grant further conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
H distributes CCR
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Motion to allow H conferees to exceed the differences on section 160.077 H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Basye, Francis, Haffner, Sharp(36), Proudie
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: O'Laughlin, Koenig, Eslinger, Arthur, Schupp
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 19 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-141)--(4133H10.41H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 18 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(4133H10.24H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sharp-36)--(4133H10.05H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 16 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-7)--(4133H10.31H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Butz)--(4133H10.27H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-7)--(4133H10.39H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-16)--(4133H10.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (West)--(4133H10.26H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 11 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schwadron)--(4133H10.48H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 11 to HCS H offered (Hurlbert)--(4133H10.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mayhew)--(4133H10.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-7)--(4133H10.07H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reedy)--(4133H10.36H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Murphy)--(4133H10.09H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.30H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rogers)--(4133H10.46H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered (Dinkins)--(4133H10.30H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.19H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 2 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lewis-6)--(4133H10.57H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(4133H10.45H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered (Richey)--(4133H10.19H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HSA 1 for HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hudson)--(4133H10.47H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered (Haffner)--(4133H10.29H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.38H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 2 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(4133H10.56H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollitt-52)--(4133H10.50H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered (Basye)--(4133H10.38H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory-51)--(4133H10.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(4133H10.37H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (O'Laughlin)--(4133S08.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(4133S08.12S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
SS for SCS S offered (O'Laughlin & Arthur)--(4133S.08F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 681 & 662) Education Committee (4133S.06C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled
|
|
|