House
|
05/11/2022
|
In Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Eslinger, Crawford, Gannon, Roberts, May
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Motion to allow S conferees to exceed the differences on section 50.815 and section 50.820 S adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Basye)--(3796H03.02H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(3796H03.05H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(3796H03.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed - Consent
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled
|
|
|