House | 05/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred: Workforce and Infrastructure Development(H) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |