House | 04/17/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H) | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |