House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |