Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2023, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2 to HA 1 and HA 1, as amended, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
HS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
HS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Committed to: Legislative Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Judiciary(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|