House
|
07/06/2023
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 141 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
SS Adopted (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 2, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Seante Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. AYES: 141 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|