House
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Laid Over (H) - HA 1, pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Adoption of HA 1 AYES: 152 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Perfection of HB 1154, as amended. AYES: 151 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred: Veterans(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|