House | 04/06/2023 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 5 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred: General Laws(H) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |