House | 05/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred: Judiciary(H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |