Senate | 05/01/2023 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Public Hearing Held (S) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2023, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 157 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Referred: Veterans(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |