House | 04/06/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Transportation Accountability(H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |