House | 04/24/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |