Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - AMENDED: Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Hearing Cancelled (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 26, 2023, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|