House | 04/18/2023 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |