Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 10, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 11:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Hearing Cancelled (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 26, 2023, 11:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 and HA 6, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred: Pensions(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|