Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | HS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | HS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | HS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Committed to: Legislative Review(H) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |