Senate | 04/13/2023 | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 and HA 2, adopted. | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |