House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |