Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 18, 2023, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committe Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Rural Community Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|