Senate | 04/27/2023 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 19 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred: Local Government(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/15/2022 | Prefiled (H) |