House | 05/05/2023 | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/20/2022 | Prefiled (H) |