House | 05/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Referred: General Laws(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/20/2022 | Prefiled (H) |