House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred: Ways and Means(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/28/2022 | Prefiled (H) |