Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 100 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 and HA 4, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: Transportation Accountability(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/28/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|