House | 04/24/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |