Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 11:45 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 18, 2023, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 and HA 3, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|