Senate | 04/13/2023 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 18 | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred: Utilities(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |