Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 27, 2023, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 13, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|