House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |