Senate | 04/20/2023 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |