Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, and SA 3, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 4, 2023, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA1 and HA 2, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Re-referred to Committee: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|