LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB769
Action History
MO
Missouri House Bill HB769
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2023 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB769
Action History
House
02/07/2023
Voted Do Pass (H)
House
02/07/2023
Executive Session Completed (H)
House
01/31/2023
Public Hearing Completed (H)
House
01/19/2023
Referred: Pensions(H)
House
01/12/2023
Read Second Time (H)
House
01/11/2023
Introduced and Read First Time (H)