House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |