Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Hearing Cancelled (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 26,2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 14
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|