Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 31
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, and HA 4, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Laid Over (H) - HA 3, pending, HA 1 and HA 2, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Rural Community Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|