House | 04/17/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred: Healthcare Reform(H) | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |