Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Hearing Cancelled (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 26, 2023, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 22 PRESENT: 22
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 and HA 4, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|